GA HB296 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-6-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to terms of superior court, so as to revise the term of court for the superior court of Hall County in the Northeastern Circuit; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hall County; Northeastern Judicial Circuit; revise term of Superior Court
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] | Rep. Timothy Barr [R] | Rep. Matt Dubnik [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #360 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #164 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #164 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-30 | Act 109 | |
2019-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House Hopper |