GA HB293 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the City of Fayetteville Public Facilities Authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fayetteville, City of; Public Facility Authority; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #83 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Vote #56 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-01SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-01SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-25SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-22HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-22HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-14HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-13HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback