GA HB293 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 24 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to admissions and confessions, so as to provide an effective date for the procedure relating to the testimony of a child's description of sexual contact or physical abuse; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Evidence; procedure relating to child's testimony of sexual contact or physical abuse; provide effective date

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #127 (Y: 161 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-03-24SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-02-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-09HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback