GA HB29 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 12 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Office of Planning and Budget, so as to require the office to prepare and publish an annual report on the wealth of Georgians; to authorize public and private assistance; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Office of Planning and Budget; annual report on wealth of Georgians; require
Sponsors
Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] | Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Rep. Shelly Hutchinson [D] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-13 | House | House Hopper |
2020-11-18 | House | House Prefiled |