GA HB29 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of Skidaway Island, approved May 7, 2018 (Ga. L. 2018, p. 3784); to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Skidaway Island, City of; compliance with constitutional requirements; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #18 (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Vote #16 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15 Effective Date
2019-02-15 Act 2
2019-02-15HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-02-14HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-02-08SenateSenate Transmitted House
2019-02-08SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-02-08SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-06HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-06HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-06HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-06HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-01-29HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-01-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-17HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-16HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback