GA HB289 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to issuance, expiration, and renewal of drivers' licenses, so as to provide for requirements for the issuance of Class C drivers' licenses; to provide for exemptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; issuance of Class C drivers' licenses; provide for requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Rep. Matt Barton [R] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #114 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-03 | House | House Hopper |