GA HB287 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to competencies and core curriculum, so as to include tobacco and vapor products in the course of instruction regarding alcohol and drugs required each year for all students in grades kindergarten through 12; to revise implementation dates; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; tobacco and vapor products in course of instruction regarding alcohol and drugs; include
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. Dave Belton [R] |
Rep. Beth Camp [R] | Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #376 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #355 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Passage: House Vote #51 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #355 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Passage: House Vote #51 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-04-27 | Act 30 | |
2021-04-27 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-17 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-17 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-03 | House | House Hopper |