GA HB287 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from income taxes, so as to delete an income tax deduction for certain physicians serving as community based faculty physicians; to create a new income tax credit for taxpayers who are licensed physicians, advanced practice registered nurses, or physician assistants who provide uncompensated preceptorship training to medical students, advanced practice registered nurse students, or physician assistant students for certain periods of time; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; certain physicians serving as community based faculty physicians; delete deduction
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Dubnik [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Butch Parrish [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #230 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #233 (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #141 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #233 (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #141 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-25 | Act 44 | |
2019-04-25 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House Hopper |