GA HB282 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., relating to local government, so as to enact the "Municipal Broadband Investment Act"; to allow for public providers of broadband service to provide such services in unserved areas; to provide for a short title; to prohibit a public provider from providing broadband service to areas that are not unserved areas unless such provider is providing such broadband service as of a date certain; to provide for the authority and jurisdiction of the Public Service Commission to make a determination as to whether an area is an unserved area and as to certain violations; to provide for procedures; to provide a cause of action and for recovery; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Municipal Broadband Investment Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] |
Rep. Benjie Harbin [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - House Vote #257 (Y: 70 N: 94 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2013-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-08 | House | House Hopper |