GA HB278 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to business corporations, so as to provide for benefit corporations; to provide for the application of the Georgia Business Corporation Code; to provide for definitions; to provide for naming; to provide for stock certificates; to provide for amendments and transactions; to provide for duties and limitations of liability of directors of benefit corporations; to provide for annual public benefit reports; to change the definition of a foreign corporation; to change provisions relating to the right to dissent; to change provisions relating to the corporate name of a foreign corporation; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Business corporations; benefit corporations; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Rep. Stacey Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50304 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/164518 |