GA HB277 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, collection, and assessment of state sales and use taxes, so as to value all flooring samples at the same rate for purposes of fair market value; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; value all flooring samples at the same rate for purposes of fair market value
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Broadrick [R] | Rep. Tom Dickson [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Paul Battles [R] |
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #244 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Vote #150 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Vote #150 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 136 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-09 | House | House Hopper |