GA HB276 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 64 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation and licensure of pharmacy benefits managers, so as to authorize the Commissioner of Insurance to promulgate certain rules and regulations and to examine and investigate certain matters with regard to pharmacy benefits managers; to prohibit pharmacy benefits managers from requiring the use of mail-order pharmacies under certain conditions; to provide for exceptions; to provide for certain prohibitions; to provide for enforcement; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Pharmacy Patient Fair Practices Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #196 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Vote #132 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-08 Act 195
2017-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-16SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-16SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-13SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback