GA HB274 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to juvenile court administration, so as to provide for a salary supplement for certain juvenile court judges; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; certain juvenile court judges; provide salary supplement
Sponsors
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Rep. James Burchett [R] |
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #666 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-31 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-03 | House | House Hopper |