GA HB273 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a homestead exemption from City of Chamblee ad valorem taxes for city purposes, approved April 4, 1997 (Ga. L. 1997, p. 3591), so as to revise a homestead exemption for residents of that city who are 65 years of age or older or who are totally disabled in order to authorize such exemption to apply to taxes levied by the city to pay interest on and to retire bonded indebtedness; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, applicability, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chamblee, City of; ad valorem tax; residents 65 years of age or older or who are totally disabled; revise homestead exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #217 (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #143 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #143 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-30 | Act 105 | |
2019-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House Hopper |