GA HB273 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 15 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to miscellaneous provisions under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to provide for a daily recess for students in kindergarten and grades one through five; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Quality Basic Education Act; daily recess for students in kindergarten and grades one through five; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Rep. Spencer Frye [D] | Rep. David Wilkerson [D] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #832 (Y: 138 N: 27 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #574 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #212 (Y: 147 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #574 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #212 (Y: 147 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hopper |