GA HB271 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 4 of Chapter 5 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to shore protection, so as to revise various provisions relative to shore protection; to revise and add definitions; to establish authority and powers of the Department of Natural Resources; to revise provisions relating to permit activities and procedures; to provide for applicability; to strike obsolete language and correct cross-references; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water resources; shore protection; revise various provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #665 (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #175 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-01HouseHouse Postponed
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback