GA HB270 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a homestead exemption from City of College Park ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes for the full amount of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that city who are disabled or who are 65 years of age or older and whose income, together with the income of the spouse who also occupies and resides at such homestead, does not exceed the maximum amount which may be received by an individual and an individual's spouse at full retirement age under the federal Social Security Act for the immediately preceding year; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

College Park, City of; ad valorem tax; municipal purposes; provide homestead exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #72 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #44 (Y: 162 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01 Effective Date 2023-05-01
2023-05-01 Act 116
2023-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2023-03-30HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2023-02-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-02-21SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-02-16HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2023-02-16HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-02-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-02-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2023-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback