GA HB270 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elections and primaries generally, so as to provide for the time periods for the mailing and issuance of absentee ballots; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; mailing and issuance of absentee ballots; provide time periods

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-02-10HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-08HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-04HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-03HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback