GA HB268 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the O.C.G.A., relating to elections and primaries generally, so as to provide for the time period for certification of election officials; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; time period for certification of election officials; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #313 (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #323 (Y: 102 N: 48 NV: 8 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #200 (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #97 (Y: 111 N: 57 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-09 Act 250
2017-05-09HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-07HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-24HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2017-03-16SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-16SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-16SenateSenate Engrossed
2017-03-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-22HouseHouse Postponed
2017-02-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback