GA HB266 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 29 of the O.C.G.A., relating to conservators of minors, so as to revise the personal property value that a natural guardian may receive of a minor without having to become a legally qualified conservator of the minor; to revise the amount of the debt owing to a minor which a natural guardian may release without approval by the court; to revise the amount of the proposed gross settlement of a minor's claim by which the natural guardian of the minor may compromise without becoming the conservator of the minor or seeking court approval; to revise the amount by which a conservator of a minor may compromise any contested or doubtful claim or release the debtor and compromise all debts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Guardian and ward; personal property value guardian may receive without becoming legal conservator of minor; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] |
Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. David Dreyer [D] | Sen. Blake Tillery [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #169 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50274 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/164452 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50274#14982 |