GA HB265 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income tax, so as to revise the provisions relating to the credit for establishing or relocating quality jobs; to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the O.C.G.A., relating to exemptions from state sales and use taxes, so as to provide a state sales tax exemption for sales of tickets, fees, or charges of admission to certain facilities that provide certain arts and education programming; to provide a state and local sales tax exemption for sales of tangible personal property used for or in the renovation or expansion of certain theaters; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; credit for establishing or relocating quality jobs; revise provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - House - House Vote #297 (Y: 154 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #187 (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #117 (Y: 155 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25 Effective Date
2017-04-25 Act 23
2017-04-25HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-22HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-14SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-14SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-14SenateSenate Engrossed
2017-03-10SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback