GA HB264 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Conference Committee Appointed #2 116th, 157th, 16th
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Conference Committee Appointed #2 116th, 157th, 16th
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 5 of Title 21 of the O.C.G.A., relating to public officials' conduct and lobbyist disclosure, so as to provide that any natural persons undertaking to promote or oppose any matter before a local coordinating entity regarding the Emergency Medical Systems Communications Program (EMSC Program) are subject to transparency and lobbyist disclosure laws; to amend Chapter 11 of Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to emergency medical services; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public officials' conduct and lobbyist disclosure; persons promoting or opposing any matter regarding the EMSC Program are subject to transparency and lobbyist disclosure laws; provide
Sponsors
Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #251 (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #253 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #223 (Y: 148 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #253 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #223 (Y: 148 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed #2 116th, 157th, 16th |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 53rd, 28th, 9th |
2019-03-29 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 157th, 116th, 43rd |
2019-03-29 | House | House Insisted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Insisted |
2019-03-29 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House Hopper |