GA HB264 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 9 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue bonds issued by the Geo. L. Smith II Georgia World Congress Center Authority, so as to increase the bonding capacity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia World Congress Center Authority; revenue bond capacity; increase

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #176 (Y: 45 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #122 (Y: 159 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-04-18 Act 18
2017-04-18HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-10SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-10SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-10SenateSenate Engrossed
2017-03-06SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-03SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-02-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback