GA HB259 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state purchasing, so as to provide an exemption from competitive bidding procedures; to increase the exemption threshold for competitive bidding procedures; to change a short title; to change a definition relative to small business assistance; to revise legislative intent; to provide for a short title; to provide for applicability; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Business Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #235 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #156 (Y: 153 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #156 (Y: 153 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 197 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-09 | House | House Hopper |