GA HB257 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local government, so as to require local government authorities to register with the Department of Community Affairs in order to be eligible for state funds; to change the deadline for local government authorities to register with said department; to prohibit authorities from incurring debt or credit obligations prior to submitting a report to said department; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government authorities; register with Department of Community Affairs; require

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #590 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Vote #73 (Y: 160 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Effective Date
2018-05-03 Act 306
2018-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-09SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-09SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-05SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2018-01-08SenateSenate Taken from Table
2017-03-28SenateSenate Tabled
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-16SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback