GA HB255 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2025-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to amend an Act providing for the election of members of the Board of Education of Brantley County, approved April 17, 1975 (Ga. L. 1975, p. 3937), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 12, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 3757), so as to change the provisions relating to the compensation of the members of the board; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Brantley County; Board of Education; compensation of members; change provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-15 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #46 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #26 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01 Effective Date 2025-01-01
2023-05-01 Act 115
2023-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2023-03-30HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2023-02-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-02-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-02-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-02-09HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2023-02-09HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-02-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-02-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-02-07HouseHouse First Readers
2023-02-06HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback