GA HB254 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 23 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to licensing of agents, agencies, subagents, counselors, and adjusters, so as to increase the Insurance Commissioner's enforcement authority with regard to adjusters; to provide for allowable types of remuneration; to provide for proof of financial responsibility; to provide for record keeping; to provide for certain consumer protections; to provide for advertising requirements; to provide for certain prohibited acts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; Commissioner's enforcement authority with regard to adjusters; increase
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] |
Rep. Steve Tarvin [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #379 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #324 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #45 (Y: 160 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #324 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #45 (Y: 160 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 185 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-02 | House | House Hopper |