GA HB254 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the composition and election of the Board of Education of Emanuel County, approved April 12, 1982 (Ga. L. 1982, p. 4049), as amended, so as to provide for nonpartisan elections for members of the board; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Emanuel County; Board of Education; provide nonpartisan elections for members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #112 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Vote #72 (Y: 125 N: 34 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Vote #72 (Y: 125 N: 34 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-03 | Act 108 | |
2017-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hopper |