GA HB253 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting certain beneficial projects and supporting certain worthy agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations, so as to increase the proportion of moneys derived from the sale of specialty license plates promoting the dog and cat reproductive sterilization support program which are to be dedicated to such program; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special license plates; dog and cat reproductive sterilization support program; increase the proportion of moneys derived from the sale

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #210 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateSenate Tabled
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2018-01-08SenateSenate Taken from Table
2017-03-28SenateSenate Tabled
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-07HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-02HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback