GA HB251 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Americus, approved April 13, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 5985), as amended, so as to provide for a city manager; to provide for appointment, qualifications, terms, removal, and vacancies; to provide for duties, powers, and responsibilities; to provide for appointment of a city clerk and finance director; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Americus, City of; provide for a city manager
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #98 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Vote #31 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Vote #31 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Veto V6 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-09 | House | House Hopper |