GA HB250 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 6 of Chapter 13 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the local excise tax on the sale or use of energy, so as to provide for the revision of certain provisions relating to the levy, collection, and administration of such excise tax; to provide for nonapplicability of such tax to certain projects; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for civil and criminal penalties; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local excise tax; sale or use of energy; revise certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Rice [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #332 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #284 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Vote #183 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #284 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Vote #183 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 260 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-07 | House | House Hopper |