GA HB249 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 and Article 2 of Chapter 16 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to controlled substances and death investigations, respectively, so as to collect more information regarding the dispensing and use of certain controlled substances; to change the frequency of reporting certain prescriptions in the electronic data base of prescription information; to clarify provisions relating to confidentiality; to change provisions relating to liability and duties; to change provisions relating to the definitions of dangerous drugs; to provide for a coroner's inquest when an individual dies of a suspected drug overdose; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances; collect more information regarding dispensing and use; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #320 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #348 (Y: 164 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #217 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #186 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-04 Act 141
2017-05-04HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-07HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-28HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2017-03-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-22SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-07HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-02HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/249
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/164348.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/166941.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167340.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167507.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/168725.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169327.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170657.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15014
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15219
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15297
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15451

Bill Comments

feedback