GA HB247 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to uniform rules of the road, so as to provide for penalties for the commission of an offense of distracted driving; to remove a process for being found not guilty of a violation in certain instances; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Uniform rules of the road; commission of an offense of distracted driving; provide for penalties
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] |
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #191 (Y: 119 N: 52 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-02 | House | House Hopper |