GA HB247 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to crimes against the person, so as to repeal an enhanced penalty relating to battery against a person 65 years of age or older; to amend Code Section 30-5-4 of the O.C.G.A., relating to reporting of need for protective services, manner and contents of report, immunity from civil or criminal liability, and privileged communications; to amend Code Section 31-7-12.1 of the O.C.G.A., relating to unlicensed personal care homes; to amend Code Section 45-17-8 of the O.C.G.A., relating to powers and duties of notaries public generally, so as to require notaries to report abuse of disabled adults or elder persons; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; battery against a person 65 years of age or older; repeal an enhanced penalty
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #191 (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-11 | House | House Hopper |