GA HB241 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 12 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to control of hazardous conditions, so as to add Krabbe disease to the list of metabolic and genetic conditions for which newborn screening may be conducted pursuant to the Department of Public Health; to provide for the screening at the option of the parent or parents; to provide for payment of fees directly to the laboratory; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cove's Law; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Matt Dubnik [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #241 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Vote #110 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Vote #110 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 190 | |
2017-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House Hopper |