GA HB238 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding ad valorem taxation of property, so as to provide an exception to a breach of the covenants for use of the property for solar power generation; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; use of property for solar power generation; provide exception to a breach of covenants
Sponsors
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] |
Rep. James Epps [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #324 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #215 (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #81 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #215 (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #81 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Effective Date | |
2017-04-17 | Act 16 | |
2017-04-17 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House Hopper |