GA HB238 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 12 of Title 17 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to legal defense for indigents, so as to change certain provisions relative to the powers and duties of the council; to change certain provisions relating to the director and the director's responsibilities; to change provisions relating to councilmembers' responsibilities; to provide for the director to appoint circuit public defenders; to change certain annual reporting requirements; to repeal an obsolete effective date Code section; to change provisions relating to the circuit public defender supervisory panel; to change provisions relating to appointing attorneys in conflict of interest cases; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Legal defense for indigents; powers and duties of council; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] | Rep. John Hatfield [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #355 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 159 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #323 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Vote #65 - Passage (Y: 159 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #323 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Vote #65 - Passage (Y: 159 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-03 | Act 51 | |
2011-05-03 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-26 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-02-28 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-28 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-15 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-10 | House First Readers |