GA HB231 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to controlled substances, so as to change certain provisions relating to Schedules I, II, IV, and V controlled substances; to change certain provisions relating to the definition of dangerous drug; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Controlled substances; Schedules I, II, IV and V; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #280 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Vote #65 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Vote #65 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Effective Date | |
2017-04-17 | Act 17 | |
2017-04-17 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hopper |