GA HB23 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-29 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-29 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of fire and other hazards to persons and property generally, so as to require every public and private school to have carbon monoxide detectors; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Carbon monoxide detectors; public and private schools; require
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jones [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Mable Thomas [D] | Rep. Michele Henson [D] |
Rep. Dexter Sharper [D] | Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2013-01-17 | House | House Hopper |
2012-12-07 | House | House Prefiled |