GA HB227 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to crimes and offenses, so as to provide for the offense of criminal interference with critical infrastructure; to provide for definitions; to provide for penalties; to amend Code Sections 35-2-36, 42-8-35.4, and 43-34-10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to composition of battalion, rank of battalion personnel, employment of recruits or cadets by commissioner, promulgation of rules and regulations as to enlistment and training of recruits or cadets, confinement in probation detention center, and notification of conviction, respectively, so as to provide for conforming cross-references; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; offense of criminal interference with critical infrastructure; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Leverett [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Tyler Smith [R] | Rep. Victor Anderson [R] |
Rep. James Burchett [R] | Rep. David Huddleston [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #352 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #304 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - Passage: House Vote #139 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #304 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - Passage: House Vote #139 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-04-26 | Act 30 | |
2023-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-02 | House | House Hopper |