GA HB221 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 9 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue bonds for the Geo. L. Smith II Georgia World Congress Center, so as to increase the limit on indebtedness; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Geo. L. Smith II Georgia World Congress Center; limit on indebtedness; increase
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] |
Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Sen. Blake Tillery [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #230 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #241 (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Vote #65 (Y: 164 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #241 (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Vote #65 (Y: 164 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-02 | Act 141 | |
2019-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House Hopper |