GA HB221 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 10 of the O.C.G.A., relating to agency, so as to update and conform provisions relating to powers of attorney to a uniform Act; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commerce and trade; powers of attorney to a uniform Act; update and conform provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #341 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #236 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #211 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-08 Act 186
2017-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-07HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-28HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-24SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-24SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-07HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-02HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-01HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback