GA HB220 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding solid waste management, so as to extend the sunset date for certain solid waste disposal surcharges; to provide for the extension of the sunset date for certain tire disposal fees; to amend Part 2 of Article 3 of Chapter 8 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to hazardous site response, so as to provide for the extension of the sunset date for certain hazardous waste management fees and hazardous substance reporting fees; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Solid waste management; certain solid waste disposal surcharges; extend sunset date
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] |
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #392 (Y: 164 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #343 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #198 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #343 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #198 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-26 | Act 55 | |
2019-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House Hopper |