GA HB220 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to superior courts, so as to provide a uniform time for issuing orders on motions; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Superior courts; issuing orders on motions; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. David Ralston [R] | Sen. John Wiles [R] |
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-04 - House - House Vote #125 - Pass (Y: 102 N: 56 NV: 9 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-04 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-04 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-06 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-02 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-30 | House First Readers |