GA HB218 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-11-126 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to having or carrying handguns, long guns, or other weapons, license requirement, and exceptions for homes, motor vehicles, private property, and other locations and conditions, so as to expand weapons carry license reciprocity in this state; to provide that persons who are not residents of this state shall be authorized to carry a weapon in this state if licensed to carry in any other state; to provide that the Attorney General shall enter into an agreement with any state that requires an agreement to recognize and give effect to weapons carry licenses for reciprocity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses; weapons carry license reciprocity in this state; expand

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-24 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute: Senate Vote #559 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Agree To Senate Sub As Am: House Vote #477 (Y: 96 N: 70 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #342 (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 31st: Senate Vote #341 (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #340 (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #98 (Y: 103 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-12 Effective Date 2022-07-01
2022-04-12 Act 597
2022-04-12HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2022-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2022-02-24SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2022-02-03HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2021-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-29SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-29SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-16SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-26SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-25HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-02-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-18HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-03HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-02HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-01HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59180
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/196427
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198031
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198809
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/200353
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201699
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/207727
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201871
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/205076
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59180#18233
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59180#18750
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59180#18751
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59180#18752
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59180#19056
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59180#19234

Bill Comments

feedback