GA HB217 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income taxes, so as to increase the amount of the aggregate cap on contributions to certain scholarship organizations in order to receive income tax credits; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax credit; certain scholarship organizations; increase amount of the aggregate cap on contributions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #764 (Y: 33 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #854 (Y: 99 N: 54 NV: 23 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #396 (Y: 100 N: 65 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #376 (Y: 12 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #377 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #293 (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Vote #142 (Y: 111 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07 Effective Date
2018-05-07 Act 424
2018-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2018-02-07SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 52nd, 21st, 1st
2018-02-01HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 46th, 171st, 36th
2018-02-01HouseHouse Insisted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-30HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-28SenateSenate Engrossed
2017-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-07HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-02HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-01HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/217
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/164175.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/166615.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167109.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169070.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170299.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/176534.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178897.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178899.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=14946
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15363
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15508
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15507
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15397
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16302
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16358

Bill Comments

feedback