GA HB215 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 12-3-114 and Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to policies to guide Department of Natural Resources in creating and administering the Georgia Scenic Trails System and to motor vehicles and traffic, respectively, so as to provide for permitted operation of electric assisted bicycles; to authorize the Department of Natural Resources to designate certain trails as open for use of electric assisted bicycles; to provide for definitions; to provide for required equipment and identification for such devices; to provide for operating standards; to provide for use of such devices on bicycle lanes and paths in certain instances; to provide for use of protective headgear in certain instances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Scenic Trails System; electric assisted bicycles; provide for permitted operation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-21HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-02-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-11HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback