GA HB213 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act known as the "Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority Act of 1965," approved March 10, 1965 (Ga. L. 1965, p. 2243), as amended, so as to provide for a permanent suspension of restrictions on the use of sales and use tax proceeds upon the submission of an independent management audit to certain officials; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority Act of 1965; permanent suspension of restrictions on use of sales and use tax proceeds upon submission of an independent management audit to certain officials; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Harry Geisinger [R] |
Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] | Rep. Patricia Gardner [D] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #406 (Y: 143 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #348 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #319 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Vote #134 (Y: 144 N: 19 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #348 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #319 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Vote #134 (Y: 144 N: 19 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-05 | Act 62 | |
2015-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-14 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-03 | House | House Hopper |