GA HB21 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Department of Administrative Services, so as to define certain terms; to create the Division of Supplier Diversity; to provide for appointment of a director; to provide for powers and duties of the director; to create the position of minority and women owned business enterprises state-wide advocate; to provide for appointment; to provide for duties; to provide for provisions for state contracts; to provide for a state-wide disparity study; to provide for contents; to provide for the structure of procurement contracts; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for the implementation of rules and regulations; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative Services, Department of; create Division of Supplier Diversity; provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-26HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-25HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-24HouseHouse Hopper
2016-12-13HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback