GA HB206 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to uniform rules of the road, so as to provide for procedure for passing sanitation vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Uniform rules of the road; procedure for passing sanitation vehicles; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] |
Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #352 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #442 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Vote #70 (Y: 159 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #442 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Vote #70 (Y: 159 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-05 | Act 58 | |
2015-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-03 | House | House Hopper |